1 / 15

160 likes | 435 Vues

How do you find the product of 23 x 15 using the area model?. 20. 3. 10. 5. In this lesson you will learn how to multiply multi-digit numbers by using the area model. Product – The result when two numbers are multiplied. For Example: 4 x 5 = 20. product.

Télécharger la présentation
## How do you find the product of 23 x 15 using the area model?

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**
Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.
Content is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use only.
Download presentation by click this link.
While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.
During download, if you can't get a presentation, the file might be deleted by the publisher.

E N D

**How do you find the product of 23 x 15 using the area model?**20 3 10 5**In this lesson you will learn how to multiply multi-digit**numbersby using the area model.**Product – The result when two numbers are multiplied.**For Example: 4 x 5 = 20 product**Multiplication is repeated addition.**32 + 32 + 32 + 32 + 32 32 x 5 Multiplication is faster!**Multiplication sentences can be represented by using an**array. 6 4 4 x 6 = 24**Multiplying by powers of 10.**36 x 10 = 360 36 x 100 = 3,600 36 x 1,000 = 36,000**Multiplying each digit as if it represents a number of**“ones.” It is important to remember the place value of each digit. 36 x 5 = 30 x 5 + 6 x 5**Multiply 23 x 15 using the area model.**20 + 3 10 + 5 200 100 30 + 15 445 x 20 3 10 200 30 15 5 100**Multiply 225 x 12 using the area model.**2000 400 200 40 50 + 10 2700 200 + 20+ 5 10 + 2 x 200 20 5 200 2000 50 10 400 40 10 2**In this lesson you have learned how to multiply multi-digit**numbersby using the area model.**In your math journal, draw an area model to find the product**of 542 x 78.**Roll a dice 4 times to fill in the blanks and create a**multiplication problem like the one below. x • Use the area model to find the product.**1). Find the multiplication sentence that matches the model**below. 40 7 • 24 x 37 • 47 x 23 • 47 + 23 • 60 x 10 20 3

More Related