1 / 7

170 likes | 536 Vues

Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers. Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers. Definitions: Factors - Are the individual numbers that are multiplied together. Product - Is the answer when two or more numbers are multiplied together . 12 x 9 108. Factors. Product.

Télécharger la présentation
## Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**
Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.
Content is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use only.
Download presentation by click this link.
While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.
During download, if you can't get a presentation, the file might be deleted by the publisher.

E N D

**Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers**Definitions: Factors -Are the individual numbers that are multiplied together. Product -Is the answer when two or more numbers are multiplied together. 12 x 9 108 Factors Product**Multiplying by Two-Digit Whole Numbers**Without Regrouping Example 1: 23 x 13 69 + 230 299 Multiply the 3 in “13” by each digit in 23. Put a “0” in the ones place and multiply the 1 in “13” by each digit in 23. Add all of the partial products to get your final answer.**Multiplying by Two-Digit Whole Numbers**With Regrouping Example 2: 993 x 68 7944 + 59580 67,524 Multiply the 8 in “68” by each digit in 993. Put a “0” in the ones place and multiply the 6 in “68” by each digit in 993. Add all of the partial products to get your final answer.**Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers**With Regrouping Example 3: 712 x 564 2848 42720 +356000 401,568 Multiply the 4 in “564” by each digit in 712. Put a “0” in the ones place and multiply the 6 in “564” by each digit in 712. Put a “0” in the ones place and in the tens place and multiply the 5 in “564” by each digit in 712 . Add all of the partial products to get your final answer.**Multiplying by Three-Digit Whole Numbers**Try these: 1.) 12 2.) 671 x 32x 54 Challenge: 3.) 751 4.) 2,213 x 234x 639**Multiplying by Multi-Digit Whole Numbers**Real-Life Application Try this one: Mark makes $663 per week. If he works 49 weeks this year, how much will he make for the entire year? Show all work.

More Related