1 / 18

260 likes | 535 Vues

Partial Products Multiplication. Step by Step. 742 X 29. Expand each number. 742=700+40+2. 742 x 29. Expand each number. 742=700+40+2. 29 = 20+9. 742 x 29. Multiply 700 x 20. 742= 700 +40+2. 29 = 20 +9. 700 x 20 = 14000. 742 x 29. Multiply 700 x 9. 742= 700 +40+2.

Télécharger la présentation
## Partial Products Multiplication

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**
Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.
Content is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use only.
Download presentation by click this link.
While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.
During download, if you can't get a presentation, the file might be deleted by the publisher.

E N D

**Partial ProductsMultiplication**Step by Step**742 X 29**Expand each number. 742=700+40+2**742 x 29**Expand each number. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9**742 x 29**Multiply 700 x 20. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000**742 x 29**Multiply 700 x 9. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300**742 x 29**Multiply 40 x 20. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800**742 x 29**Multiply 40 x 9. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360**742 x 29**Multiply 2 x 20. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40**742 x 29**Multiply 2 x 9. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40 2 x 9 = 18**742 x 29**Now, add all you products. 742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40 2 x 9 = +18 21,518**742 x 29 =**21,518**What if there are decimals in the problem???**If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.**What if there are decimals in the problem???**If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068**What if there are decimals in the problem???**If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal?**What if there are decimals in the problem???**If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal? I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem.. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068**What if there are decimals in the problem???**If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal? I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem.. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 So I will have 3 digits behind the decimal in my answer!!! 35.4 * 3.42 = 121.068**35.4 * 3.42 = 121.068**Cool man!! I can’t believe it’s so easy!!!!!!!!!!!

More Related