1 / 16

190 likes | 1.2k Vues

Lattice Multiplication. Step-by-Step. 356 * 25 =. I don’t remember how to multiply!!!. I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice Multiplication. HELP!!!. 356 * 25.

Télécharger la présentation
## Lattice Multiplication

**An Image/Link below is provided (as is) to download presentation**
Download Policy: Content on the Website is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use and may not be sold / licensed / shared on other websites without getting consent from its author.
Content is provided to you AS IS for your information and personal use only.
Download presentation by click this link.
While downloading, if for some reason you are not able to download a presentation, the publisher may have deleted the file from their server.
During download, if you can't get a presentation, the file might be deleted by the publisher.

E N D

**Lattice Multiplication**Step-by-Step**356 * 25 =**I don’t remember how to multiply!!!**I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice**Multiplication. HELP!!!**356 * 25**Make a grid the exact size of your problem. A 2 digit number times a 3 digit number gets a 2 x 3 grid. Draw a diagonal line in each box. 5 3 6 2 5**356 * 25**Multiply 6 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 1 2 2 5**356 * 25**Multiply 5 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 1 1 2 0 2 5**356 * 25**Multiply 3 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. Use a zero as a place holder. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 5**356 * 25**Multiply 6 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 3 5 0**356 * 25**Multiply 5 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 2 3 5 5 0**356 * 25**Multiply 3 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0**356 * 25**Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 0**356 * 25**Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 0 0**356 * 25**Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 5 5 0 9 0 0**356 * 25**Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 8 5 5 0 9 0 0**356 * 25**Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 3 6 0 1 1 +1 2 0 6 2 1 2 3 5 8 5 5 0 9 0 0**That is Soooo Cool!!!**Thanks! 356 * 25 = 8,900

More Related